LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX51
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX51
Compare Versions
SBX51 Chaptered January 7, 2010
SBX51 Enrolled January 6, 2010
SBX51 Amended January 5, 2010
SBX51 Amended December 3, 2009
SBX51 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX51 Amended October 29, 2009
SBX51 Introduced August 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SBX51 Chaptered January 7, 2010
SBX51 Enrolled January 6, 2010
SBX51 Amended January 5, 2010
SBX51 Amended December 3, 2009
SBX51 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX51 Amended October 29, 2009
SBX51 Introduced August 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare