LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX618
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX618
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX618
Action History
05/10/2010
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
05/04/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
04/27/2010
Set for hearing May 12.
04/26/2010
Hearing postponed by committee.
04/23/2010
Set for hearing April 28.
04/21/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on REV. & TAX.