08/10/2010 | Set for hearing August 12. | |||
08/02/2010 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/15/2010 | Set for hearing August 2. | |||
06/30/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) | |||
06/15/2010 | Set for hearing June 23. | |||
06/09/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/04/2010 | Set for hearing June 9. | |||
05/26/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on REV. & TAX. |