LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX71
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX71
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX71
Compare Versions
SBX71 Chaptered November 12, 2009
SBX71 Enrolled November 4, 2009
SBX71 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX71 Amended November 2, 2009
SBX71 Amended October 29, 2009
SBX71 Introduced October 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SBX71 Chaptered November 12, 2009
SBX71 Enrolled November 4, 2009
SBX71 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX71 Amended November 2, 2009
SBX71 Amended October 29, 2009
SBX71 Introduced October 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare