LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX77
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX77
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX77
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 28, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
November 4, 2009
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
November 10, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
November 3, 2009
Compare
Bill
November 2, 2009
Compare
Bill
October 29, 2009
Compare