LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX817
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX817
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX817
Action History
03/11/2010
From Assembly without further action.
02/11/2010
Permission granted to take up without reference to committee or file. Read second time. To third reading.
02/04/2010
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
02/04/2010
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 0. Page 32.) To Assembly.
02/02/2010
Read second time. To third reading.
02/01/2010
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
01/20/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS.