03/24/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
03/12/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
03/08/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 114.) To enrollment. | |||
03/08/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 146.) To Senate. | |||
03/04/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 137.) To third reading. | |||
02/22/2010 | To Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and APPR. From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/18/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/18/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 73.) To Assembly. | |||
02/17/2010 | Set for hearing February 17. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 79.) Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/16/2010 | Set for hearing February 16. From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 62.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/10/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
02/08/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/05/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |