LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX832
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX832
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX832
Compare Versions
SBX832 Enrolled March 15, 2010
SBX832 Amended March 4, 2010
SBX832 Amended February 24, 2010
SBX832 Amended February 11, 2010
SBX832 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SBX832 Enrolled March 15, 2010
SBX832 Amended March 4, 2010
SBX832 Amended February 24, 2010
SBX832 Amended February 11, 2010
SBX832 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare