|
03/22/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2009-10 Eighth Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 119.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading. Unanimous consent granted to consider without reference to file. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 164.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on March 10.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on March 9.)
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U&C.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on U&C.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 88.) Placed on third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 86.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Set for hearing February 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 79.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Set for hearing February 18.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Set for hearing February 17. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 79.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Set for hearing February 12.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|