03/11/2010 | Died on file. | |||
02/23/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To third reading. (February 22 amended version corrected February 24.) Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |||
02/11/2010 | Permission granted to take up without reference to committee or file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/04/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/04/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 0. Page 29.) To Assembly. | |||
02/02/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/01/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |