10/07/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 5222.) Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5222.) | |||
10/06/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
01/12/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/11/2010 | From inactive file to second reading file. | |||
09/08/2009 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Ducheny. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 2079.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) | |||
08/25/2009 | Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.) | |||
08/17/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/29/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1319.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/02/2009 | Set for hearing June 16. | |||
02/05/2009 | To Com. on E., R. & C.A. | |||
01/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |||
01/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |