LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA11
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA11
Action History
05/13/2009
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 915.) Reconsideration granted.
04/14/2009
Set for hearing May 13.
03/09/2009
To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and E., R. & C.A.
02/25/2009
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
02/24/2009
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.