06/16/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/02/2009 | Set for hearing June 16. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 916.) Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and E., R. & C.A. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |