04/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/12/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/08/2010 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on B. & F.R. and E., R. & C.A. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |