09/01/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 2080.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) | |||
08/25/2009 | Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Set for hearing July 23. Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
07/15/2009 | Set for hearing July 20. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1632.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/19/2009 | Set for hearing July 7. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on E., R. & C.A. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |