06/17/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1319.) | |||
06/02/2009 | Set for hearing June 16. | |||
05/20/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 962.) Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set for hearing May 20. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and E., R. & C.A. | |||
03/11/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 10. | |||
03/10/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |