|
04/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.R. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 2080.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Set for hearing July 23. Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set for hearing July 20.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1632.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2009
|
Set for hearing July 7.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|