LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA26
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA26
Action History
04/21/2010
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3296.) Reconsideration granted.
04/16/2010
Set for hearing April 21.
04/14/2010
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
04/06/2010
Set for hearing April 14.
02/11/2010
To Coms. on ED. and E., R., & C.A.
02/02/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
02/01/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.