LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA28
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA28
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA28
Action History
06/09/2010
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3861.) Reconsideration granted.
06/03/2010
Set for hearing June 9.
05/27/2010
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., R., & C.A.
05/24/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
02/25/2010
To Com. on RLS.
02/12/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
02/11/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.