LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA3
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA3
Action History
04/23/2009
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/14/2009
Set for hearing May 13.
01/29/2009
To Coms. on REV. & TAX., E., R. & C.A. and APPR.
12/02/2008
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
12/01/2008
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.