LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA30
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA30
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA30
Action History
08/20/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
06/23/2010
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
06/15/2010
Set for hearing June 23.
03/17/2010
To Coms. on RLS. and E., R., & C.A.
03/04/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 3.
03/03/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.