09/01/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 2079.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) | |||
08/27/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
08/25/2009 | Set for hearing August 27. | |||
08/25/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1945.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/21/2009 | Set for hearing August 25. | |||
08/19/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Coms. on RLS. and E., R. & C.A. | |||
12/03/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2. | |||
12/02/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |