LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA7
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA7
Action History
02/24/2009
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
02/23/2009
Read second time. To third reading.
02/18/2009
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
01/29/2009
To Coms. on RLS. and E., R. & C.A.
01/16/2009
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
01/15/2009
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.