02/19/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2009. | |||
02/19/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 5 p.m. | |||
02/19/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
02/19/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 358.) Read second time. Read and adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 360.) To Senate. | |||
02/19/2009 | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 166.) Read second time. Read third time. Amended. (Page 167.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 167.) Read and adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 169.) To Assembly. | |||
02/18/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Coms. on RLS. and E., R. & C.A. | |||
01/16/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 15. | |||
01/15/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |