California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR100 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/04/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 100CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 70 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 4, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cox APRIL 12, 2010 Relative to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 100, Cox. CHP Officer Douglas "Scott" Russell Memorial Freeway. This measure would designate a portion of State Route 50 in the community of Shingle Springs in El Dorado County as the CHP Officer Douglas "Scott" Russell Memorial Freeway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Douglas "Scott" Russell was born on September 18, 1960, in Castro Valley. He graduated from Amador High School in 1978, where he played offensive tackle on the football team, saxophone in the school band, and clarinet in the marching band, and he later attended Chabot College for two years before joining the California Highway Patrol (CHP) Academy; and WHEREAS, After graduation from the academy in October of 1985, Officer Russell, CHP badge number 11619, served four years in Hayward. Officer Russell later had assignments in the Bridgeport area and the Investigative Services Section, where he was selected to serve on the Campaign Against Marijuana Program. In June of 2000, Officer Russell was assigned to the Placerville area; and WHEREAS, Officer Russell was married to the love of his life, Lynn McCourtney, in April of 1997. They enjoyed dining out with friends, spending time in their backyard oasis, and entertaining during the Christmas holidays. In 2007 Lynn was diagnosed with breast cancer. Officer Russell went into battle alongside his wife. He was a wonderful caregiver and even shaved his head in show of support when his wife was undergoing chemotherapy; and WHEREAS, Officer Russell was admired for his keen investigative skills, strong work ethic, enchanting sense of humor, impressive athletic ability, stunning professionalism, and heartfelt concern for the safety and well-being of others. Officer Russell was well respected by his fellow officers and supervisors, which earned him Officer of the Year in 2003. In his spare time, Officer Russell was an avid golfer and forged many life-long friendships while on the golf course; and WHEREAS, On July 31, 2007, Officer Russell was tragically struck by a fleeing suspect's vehicle as he deployed a spike strip to end a pursuit on eastbound State Route 50 in the community of Shingle Springs in El Dorado County; and WHEREAS, Officer Russell is survived by his wife, Lynn M. Russell, as well as his mother Betty Elliot, sister, Heidi Kaye, nephew Scott Kaye, and nieces Danielle and Dawn Kaye; and WHEREAS, Officer Russell served as an important and invaluable member of the California Highway Patrol for over 22 years and made the ultimate sacrifice of giving his life in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Officer Russell will always be admired for his hard work and dedication to the CHP and the citizens of California. Officer Russell was an outstanding man and will never be forgotten; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Russell's ultimate sacrifice for the residents of this state, it is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Route 50, commonly known as U.S. 50, in El Dorado County in his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates a portion of State Route 50, in the vicinity of eastbound Post-mile 08.533 and westbound Post-mile 08.598 in the community of Shingle Springs in El Dorado County, as the CHP Officer Douglas "Scott" Russell Memorial Freeway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation, and to the author for appropriate distribution.