BILL NUMBER: SCR 105CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 95 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 20, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 20, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 7, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Florez (Coauthor: Senator Ashburn) APRIL 26, 2010 Relative to the National Purple Heart Trail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 105, Florez. National Purple Heart Trail. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 223 in the County of Kern to be included in the National Purple Heart Trail. The measure would also request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs. WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail was established in 1992 for the purpose of commemorating and honoring men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail courses its way across the vast majority of the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2001, pursuant to Senate Concurrent Resolution 14, the Legislature designated portions of State Highway Routes 5 and 80 as California's selections for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, In 2009, pursuant to Assembly Concurrent Resolution 12, the Legislature designated a portion of State Highway Route 101 for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, The Legislature finds that it is appropriate to designate additional portions of the state highway system to be included in the National Purple Heart Trail in order to honor the men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 223 from State Highway Route 99 to State Highway Route 58, in the County of Kern, for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing that special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.