BILL NUMBER: SCR 106CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 124 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wright (Coauthor: Senator Price) APRIL 26, 2010 Relative to the Deputy Chief Kenneth O. Garner Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 106, Wright. Deputy Chief Kenneth O. Garner Memorial Exit. This measure would designate the Florence Avenue exit of State Highway Route 110, in the City of Los Angeles, as the Deputy Chief Kenneth O. Garner Memorial Exit. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Kenneth O. Garner was born on November 28, 1955, in Hot Springs, Arkansas, the third of four children born to Otto and Mary Garner, and, because his parents were both enlisted in the United States Army during his childhood, he traveled the world and lived in Taiwan, Germany, and Japan; and WHEREAS, Kenneth O. Garner graduated from San Pedro High School in 1973 and received his Associate of Arts Degree in Administration of Justice from Los Angeles Harbor College in 1975. He received his Bachelor of Arts Degree in Psychology from the California State University, Dominguez Hills in 1981. He was a graduate of the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) National Academy, and the Supervisory Leadership Institute and the Senior Management Institute Program (Boston University); and WHEREAS, Kenneth O. Garner was appointed to the Los Angeles Police Department (LAPD) on June 6, 1977. As a police officer his assignments included Southwest Area, 77th Street Area, Central Area, 77th Street Vice, and Southeast Area. Upon promotion to Sergeant in 1986, his assignments included Central Area, Operations-South Bureau C.R.A.S.H., 77th Street Area, Internal Affairs Division, and Operations-South Bureau, where he served as a Commander's Aide. After being promoted to Lieutenant he was assigned to Wilshire Area and South Traffic Division as a Watch Commander; and WHEREAS, In 1998, Lieutenant Garner was promoted to the rank of Captain. His first assignment was in Foothill Area as the Commanding Officer of the Operations-Support Division. He was also assigned as the Commanding Officer of South Traffic Division, Foothill Area, Transit Bus Division, and the 77th Street Area; and WHEREAS, On October 2, 2005, Captain Garner was promoted to the rank of Commander and assigned as the commanding officer of Personnel Group. In this assignment, and among his many responsibilities, Commander Garner was responsible for overseeing sworn, civilian, and reserve recruitment and hiring for the department. He was charged with the enormous task of furthering the mayor's hiring initiative to increase the LAPD's authorized strength to 10,000 sworn employees by 2010, the highest number of officers in LAPD history. Due in large part to Commander Garner's efforts, the LAPD's current sworn deployment is now at 9,895, a milestone achievement for the department. This accomplishment is indicative that the department is on pace to reach the mayor's goal of 10,000 officers later this year; and WHEREAS, On July 1, 2007, a month after celebrating his 30th year with the department, Commander Garner was promoted to the rank of Deputy Chief of Police. He was soon assigned as the Commanding Officer of Operations-West Bureau, where he oversaw all police operations in the Hollywood, Wilshire, West Los Angeles, and Pacific Areas and West Traffic Division; and WHEREAS, On March 2, 2008, Deputy Chief Garner returned to the community where he grew up and assumed command of Operations-South Bureau, where he led the Criminal Gang/Homicide Group, 77th Street, Southwest, Southeast, Harbor Areas, and South Traffic Division; and WHEREAS, Deputy Chief Garner was a member in good standing with the Oscar Joel Bryand Foundation and the Association of Black Law Enforcement Executives, and was a member of the Epsilon Kappa Chapter of the Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity. He was also a member of the FBI National Academy Association, the Northeast Toastmasters Club, and the Los Angeles Police Command Officers Association. He was recipient of the Trailblazer Award in 2008, where he was recognized for his outstanding contribution to the progress of African Americans in the City of Los Angeles. He received numerous community citations as well as awards from the United States Congress, California State Assembly, and various church and community organizations for his involvement and dedication to the community; and WHEREAS, Deputy Chief Garner was a firm believer that teamwork played a significant role in achieving success. He was truly determined to create fundamental change for the people who live and work in the south region of the City of Los Angeles. He supported residential, business, and community organizations such as Neighborhood Watch, the Watts Gang Task Force, and the Los Angeles Urban League and Community Build. Deputy Chief Garner was also committed to increasing the recognition and effectiveness of gang intervention in the most troubled parts of the community. He also initiated an innovative program for community re-entry and rehabilitation of parolees, believing they deserved an opportunity for a better life; and WHEREAS, Deputy Chief Garner enjoyed music, smooth jazz, and R&B, was an avid reader, and a huge fan of the Los Angeles Dodgers and Lakers. He was also a volunteer coach for youth basketball, baseball, and football at the Mar Vista Recreation Center; and WHEREAS, Deputy Chief Garner passed away unexpectedly on February 28, 2009, at the age of 53 years; and WHEREAS, Deputy Chief Garner's legacy will continue through his beloved daughter, Lauren; his loving parents, Otto and Mary; his brother, David, and sisters, Carolyn and Nelianne; his nephews and nieces; his Los Angeles Police Department family; a host of friends; and thousands of community members, whom he was proud to serve; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Florence Avenue exit of State Highway Route 110 in the City of Los Angeles, as the Deputy Chief Kenneth O. Garner Memorial Exit; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.