09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/31/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6868.) To Senate. | |||
08/26/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 26.) | |||
08/19/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/19/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4658.) To Assembly. | |||
08/09/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |