California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR122 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/07/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 122CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 132 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe AUGUST 9, 2010 Relative to the Esteban Bahena Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 122, Kehoe. Esteban Bahena Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a portion of State Highway Route 163 in the City of San Diego as the Esteban Bahena Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Esteban Bahena was employed as an emergency medical technician with the San Diego Medical Service/Rural Metro; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bahena graduated from Mount Miguel High School in Spring Valley, subsequently graduated from the University of California at San Diego, and was a resident of Lemon Grove; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bahena provided extraordinary public service and made an exemplary contribution to the public good; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bahena was killed in the line of duty on the morning of April 1, 2010, on State Highway Route 163 in the City of San Diego while providing emergency assistance to persons involved in two vehicle accidents; and WHEREAS, At the time of his death, Mr. Bahena was only 24 years of age; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bahena is survived by his mother Tarcilla, his father Esteban, and two sisters, Rosa Barajas and Angelica Bahena; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Mr. Bahena's ultimate sacrifice for the residents of this state, it is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Highway Route 163 in his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 163 between Washington Street and State Highway Route 8 (Interstate 8) in the City of San Diego as the Esteban Bahena Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the costs, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.