07/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/16/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2491.) To Senate. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |||
07/01/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
06/30/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/22/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
06/08/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
06/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1221.) To Assembly. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/11/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |