05/14/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/14/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1370.) To Senate. | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 30.) | |||
04/02/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
03/23/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 328.) To Assembly. | |||
03/16/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |