LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR20
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR20
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR20
Compare Versions
SCR20 Chaptered September 1, 2009
SCR20 Enrolled August 27, 2009
SCR20 Amended May 28, 2009
SCR20 Amended May 12, 2009
SCR20 Amended April 20, 2009
SCR20 Introduced March 9, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR20 Chaptered September 1, 2009
SCR20 Enrolled August 27, 2009
SCR20 Amended May 28, 2009
SCR20 Amended May 12, 2009
SCR20 Amended April 20, 2009
SCR20 Introduced March 9, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare