05/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/11/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
05/06/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 798.) To enrollment. | |||
04/29/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
04/23/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
04/23/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1071.) To Senate. | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 16.) | |||
03/23/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/12/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/12/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 287.) To Assembly. | |||
03/09/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |