04/20/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/20/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
04/19/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3221.) To enrollment. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4688.) To Senate. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 12.) | |||
10/26/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/23/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 543.) To Assembly. | |||
04/13/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
03/25/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |