08/24/2009 | Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
08/20/2009 | Set for hearing August 25. | |||
08/17/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
07/02/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/19/2009 | Set for hearing July 7. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on E., R. & C.A. | |||
12/02/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |