|
07/16/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2492.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1149.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 876.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|