06/17/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/17/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
06/15/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2137.) To Senate. | |||
06/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 8.) | |||
05/26/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 899.) To Assembly. | |||
04/14/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |