LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR34
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR34
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR34
Compare Versions
SCR34 Chaptered September 25, 2009
SCR34 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SCR34 Amended September 1, 2009
SCR34 Amended July 1, 2009
SCR34 Amended May 26, 2009
SCR34 Introduced April 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR34 Chaptered September 25, 2009
SCR34 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SCR34 Amended September 1, 2009
SCR34 Amended July 1, 2009
SCR34 Amended May 26, 2009
SCR34 Introduced April 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare