08/27/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9 a.m. | |||
08/24/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.) | |||
08/20/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2678.) To Senate. | |||
07/01/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 926.) To Assembly. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |