|
08/20/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6300.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on August 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4307.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Set for hearing June 28.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3930.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Set for hearing June 15.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|