07/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4204.) To enrollment. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 5852.) To Senate. | |||
06/23/2010 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
05/04/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
08/27/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/24/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1909.) To Assembly. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1411.) To Third Reading. | |||
06/16/2009 | Set for hearing June 23. | |||
05/18/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/29/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |