08/11/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/11/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/09/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4402.) To enrollment. | |||
06/29/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 5850.) To Senate. | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) To Third Reading. (Heard in Committee on June 16.) | |||
08/27/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/24/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1910.) To Assembly. | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |