09/25/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/25/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
09/08/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2268.) To enrollment. | |||
09/03/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
09/02/2009 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2918.) To Senate. | |||
09/01/2009 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 25.) | |||
08/24/2009 | To Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
07/24/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
07/24/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1807.) To Assembly. | |||
07/23/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |