06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4:50 p.m. | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 5738.) To Senate. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
01/21/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
09/11/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
09/10/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2395.) To Assembly. | |||
09/03/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |