LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR62
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR62
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR62
Action History
04/07/2010
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/23/2010
Set for hearing April 13.
03/10/2010
Set for hearing March 23.
01/21/2010
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
01/11/2010
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.