02/22/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2010. | |||
02/22/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
02/18/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2830.) To enrollment. | |||
02/08/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
02/04/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Page 3977.) To Senate. | |||
02/01/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on February 1.) | |||
01/28/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
01/28/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2728.) To Assembly. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |