08/20/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/20/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/17/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6300.) To Senate. | |||
08/12/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.) | |||
08/05/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4199.) To Assembly. | |||
05/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/02/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |