|
08/04/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 7.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3278.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|