02/24/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2009. | |||
02/24/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
02/23/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 374.) To Senate. | |||
02/14/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) | |||
01/29/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
01/29/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 116.) To Assembly. | |||
01/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/05/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |