05/13/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2010. | |||
05/13/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
05/10/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3474.) To enrollment. | |||
05/06/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5055.) To Senate. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 29.) | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/15/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3119.) To Assembly. | |||
02/09/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |